U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-mj-90063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sidney
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 21, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • January 21, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 21, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • December 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • December 15, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 15, 2021: [~Util - Speedy Trial/Excludable Start]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 12, 2021: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 08, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • September 14, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • September 14, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.