U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-mj-90062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Salmon
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint/Case]
  • December 08, 2022: [Dismiss Complaint/Case]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Deferred Prosecution]
  • February 15, 2022: [Deferral of Prosecution]
  • February 15, 2022: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
  • February 14, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Arraignment]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • October 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • October 08, 2021: [~Util - Speedy Trial/Excludable Start]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • September 14, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • September 14, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.