U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-po-90066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bluhm
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint/Case]
  • April 25, 2025: [Dismiss Complaint/Case]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • October 08, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • October 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • September 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • September 20, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • September 20, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.