U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-mj-06133-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mallow
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint/Case]
  • April 18, 2022: [Dismiss Complaint/Case]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Deferred Prosecution]
  • March 29, 2022: [Deferral of Prosecution]
  • March 29, 2022: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
  • March 29, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • February 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 22, 2022: [~Util - Speedy Trial/Excludable Start]
  • February 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 25, 2022: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • January 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • January 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice Re Pro Se Mailing]
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 21, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • September 21, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.