U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-mj-90072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tripp
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint/Case]
  • November 01, 2022: [Dismiss Complaint/Case]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Deferred Prosecution]
  • December 06, 2021: [Deferral of Prosecution]
  • December 06, 2021: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
  • December 06, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge-Misdemeanor Case]
  • December 06, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Continue]
  • October 22, 2021: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • October 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • October 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • September 28, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • September 28, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.