U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-po-90071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pickett-Inge
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint/Case]
  • January 03, 2023: [Dismiss Complaint/Case]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Deferred Prosecution]
  • January 21, 2022: [Deferral of Prosecution]
  • January 21, 2022: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
  • January 21, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Status Conference]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • October 22, 2021: [Arraignment - Petty Offense]
  • October 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • October 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • September 28, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • September 28, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.