U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-po-90070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 10, 2021: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
  • December 08, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • December 08, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 08, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • December 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Status Conference]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • October 22, 2021: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 22, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • October 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • September 28, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • September 28, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.