U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-mj-90069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Monroe
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • September 29, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
  • September 01, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 01, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 01, 2022: [Sentencing]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order]
  • July 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 11, 2022: [~Util - Speedy Trial - Procedural Interval Start]
  • May 10, 2022: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 03, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Status Conference]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge-Misdemeanor Case]
  • November 05, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 05, 2021: [~Util - Speedy Trial/Excludable Start]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • October 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • October 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • September 28, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • September 28, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.