U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-mj-90068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 15, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 15, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 15, 2021: [Sentencing]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • November 10, 2021: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
  • November 10, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • November 05, 2021: [Status Conference]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 22, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • October 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • September 28, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • September 28, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.