U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-po-90067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Crenshaw
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint/Case]
  • December 06, 2021: [Dismiss Complaint/Case]
  • December 06, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Status Conference]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • October 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • October 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 13, 2021: [Mail Returned]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • September 28, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • September 28, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.