U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-mj-90074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cole
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Prob 12C PUBLIC Petition/Order for Warrant or Summons for Offender Under Supervision]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • December 13, 2022: [Status Conference]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 08, 2022: [Prob 12C PUBLIC Petition/Order for Warrant or Summons for Offender Under Supervision]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 16, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 16, 2022: [Sentencing]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 11, 2022: [~Util - Speedy Trial - Procedural Interval Start]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • April 13, 2022: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
  • April 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 15, 2022: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • January 20, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • November 05, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • November 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Mail Returned]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • September 29, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • September 29, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.