U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-mj-90073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fiene
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 27, 2022: [Sentencing]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Continue]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 02, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Mail Returned]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
  • February 14, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 06, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge-Misdemeanor Case]
  • December 06, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 06, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 02, 2021: [Discovery]
  • December 02, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • November 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • October 22, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • October 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 22, 2021: [~Util - Speedy Trial/Excludable Start]
  • October 12, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • October 04, 2021: [Mail Returned]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • September 29, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • September 29, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.