U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-08208-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wright
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
  • January 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Detention]
  • December 30, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 30, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 30, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 30, 2021: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
  • December 27, 2021: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • December 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 27, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order re: Due Process Protections Act]
  • December 27, 2021: [Arrest]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Withdrawal and Entry of Appearance of Substituted Counsel]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.