U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cm-50064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davis
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • September 27, 2024: [Detention]
  • September 27, 2024: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Motion for Detention (Oral)]
  • September 27, 2024: [Status Conference]
  • September 27, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 12, 2022: [Prob 12B Request/Order Modifying Conditions/Term of Supervision]
  • May 11, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 06, 2022: [Violation Report]
  • May 02, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 21, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 21, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 21, 2022: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • March 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 21, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 21, 2022: [Arrest]
  • March 18, 2022: [Withdrawal and Entry of Appearance of Substituted Counsel]
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.