U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-mj-90075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tejada
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Mail Returned]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 15, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • February 14, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 14, 2022: [Sentencing]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 17, 2021: [~Util - Speedy Trial/Excludable Start]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 09, 2021: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • November 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • November 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • October 14, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • October 14, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.