U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-mj-90079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint/Case]
  • August 17, 2022: [Dismiss Complaint/Case]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Deferred Prosecution]
  • January 24, 2022: [Deferral of Prosecution]
  • January 24, 2022: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
  • January 24, 2022: [Status Conference]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • November 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • November 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • October 14, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • October 14, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.