U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-po-90077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Parkes
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
  • October 25, 2022: [Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 25, 2022: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 25, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • September 15, 2022: [Revoke]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Deferred Prosecution]
  • April 13, 2022: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
  • April 13, 2022: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
  • April 13, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 11, 2022: [Deferral of Prosecution]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Status Conference]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 05, 2021: [Arraignment - Petty Offense]
  • November 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • November 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • October 14, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • October 14, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.