U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-mj-05112-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnston
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Deferral of Prosecution Allowed]
  • November 10, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Deferred Prosecution]
  • November 01, 2021: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
  • November 01, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • November 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • November 01, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • November 01, 2021: [Deferral of Prosecution]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 22, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 22, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 22, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • October 22, 2021: [~Util - Sealed Document-use ONLY with other selection]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.