U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-mj-90081-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sangster
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 11, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • April 08, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 08, 2022: [Sentencing]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Mail Returned]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 24, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 06, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • December 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • December 03, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 03, 2021: [~Util - Speedy Trial/Excludable Start]
  • December 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • November 03, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • November 03, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.