U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-po-90080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Depradines
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 28, 2022: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
  • November 22, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • November 21, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 21, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 04, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 09, 2022: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • August 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • August 03, 2022: [Mail Returned]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • July 19, 2022: [Mail Returned]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • December 03, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • December 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • November 03, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • November 03, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.