U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-mj-90085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Turner
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 25, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 22, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 22, 2022: [Sentencing]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Status Conference]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge-Misdemeanor Case]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 06, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Speedy Trial/Excludable Start]
  • December 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Discovery]
  • November 22, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • November 08, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • November 08, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.