U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-mj-90084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stanley
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Status Conference]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge-Misdemeanor Case]
  • February 14, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Speedy Trial - Procedural Interval Start]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 24, 2022: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • January 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • December 03, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • December 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • November 08, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • November 08, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.