U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-mj-90086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Anaab
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint/Case]
  • December 07, 2022: [Dismiss Complaint/Case]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Deferred Prosecution]
  • February 15, 2022: [Deferral of Prosecution]
  • February 15, 2022: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
  • February 14, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • December 17, 2021: [Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 17, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • December 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • December 17, 2021: [~Util - Speedy Trial/Excludable Start]
  • December 17, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • November 22, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • November 22, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.