U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-po-90087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McMillian-Harris
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint/Case]
  • April 15, 2025: [Dismiss Complaint/Case]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • January 26, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • January 06, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • December 17, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • December 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • November 24, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • November 24, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.