U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:22-po-90004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Marks
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint/Case]
  • June 13, 2022: [Dismiss Complaint/Case]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Status Conference]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Arraignment - Petty Offense]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • January 18, 2022: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • January 18, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.