U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-da-00200-SAC
  • Case Name: In Re: Non-Referred Discipline Cases
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Discipline/Non-Referred]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Discipline/Non-Referred]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Original Proceedings in Discipline]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order of Discipline - Other Court]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order of Reinstatement - Other Court]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order of Reinstatement - Other Court]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order of Discipline - Other Court]
  • November 15, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 08, 2022: [Letter]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order of Discipline - Other Court]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order of Reinstatement - Other Court]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order of Discipline - Other Court]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order of Discipline - Other Court]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order of Discipline - Other Court]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order of Reinstatement - Other Court]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order of Discipline - Other Court]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Original Proceedings in Discipline]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order of Discipline - Other Court]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order of Discipline - Other Court]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order of Discipline - Other Court]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order of Discipline - Other Court]
  • June 01, 2022: [Original Proceedings in Discipline]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Original Proceedings in Discipline]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order of Discipline - Other Court]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order of Discipline - Other Court]
  • May 12, 2022: [Original Proceedings in Discipline]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order of Discipline - Other Court]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Original Proceedings in Discipline]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order of Discipline - Other Court]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order of Reinstatement - Other Court]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order of Discipline - Other Court]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Original Proceedings in Discipline]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.