U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:22-po-90005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gladden
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 30, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • April 13, 2022: [Arraignment - Petty Offense]
  • April 07, 2022: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 09, 2022: [Discovery]
  • February 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • January 20, 2022: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • January 20, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.