U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-mj-90092-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vilella
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 23, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • May 20, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 20, 2022: [Sentencing]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Status Conference]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge-Misdemeanor Case]
  • February 14, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Speedy Trial/Excludable Start]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • January 24, 2022: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 24, 2022: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • January 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • January 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.