U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:22-po-90007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Noel
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 03, 2022: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
  • June 03, 2022: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
  • June 03, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • June 03, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 03, 2022: [Sentencing]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 13, 2022: [Arraignment - Petty Offense]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 11, 2022: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • March 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • March 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 02, 2022: [Mail Returned]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 10, 2022: [Mail Returned]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • January 27, 2022: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • January 27, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.