U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:22-mj-90006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gomez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Deferred Prosecution]
  • June 27, 2022: [Deferral of Prosecution]
  • June 27, 2022: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
  • June 27, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Status Conference]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 11, 2022: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • March 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • March 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • January 27, 2022: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • January 27, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.