U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:22-po-90008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Powe
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 25, 2022: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
  • October 25, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • October 24, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 24, 2022: [Sentencing]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Status Conference]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Arraignment - Petty Offense]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • April 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • March 11, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • March 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • January 27, 2022: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • January 27, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.