U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-mj-06011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Esquivel
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Receipt for Passport - Surrendered]
  • February 04, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 04, 2022: [Bond]
  • February 04, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 04, 2022: [Withdrawal and Entry of Appearance of Substituted Counsel]
  • February 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 03, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Detention]
  • January 31, 2022: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
  • January 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • January 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 31, 2022: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order re: Due Process Protections Act]
  • January 31, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 31, 2022: [Arrest]
  • January 28, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.