U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-po-70068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Torres
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • July 13, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • July 07, 2022: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Docket Call]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • May 19, 2022: [Docket Call]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • April 06, 2022: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • March 09, 2022: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 02, 2022: [Reassigning Case]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 31, 2022: [Docket Call]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.