U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-po-70061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dyer
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Docket Call]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 13, 2022: [Docket Call]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • March 02, 2022: [Reassigning Case]
  • March 02, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 31, 2022: [Docket Call]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.