U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:22-mj-90012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zapote
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order re: Due Process Protections Act]
  • May 12, 2025: [Court Information Sheet]
  • May 12, 2025: [Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 12, 2025: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • May 12, 2025: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • May 12, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Entry of Appearance by USA]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • March 11, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • March 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • February 08, 2022: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • February 08, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.