U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:22-po-90011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moore
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 11, 2022: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
  • April 11, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • April 08, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 08, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 08, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 05, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 11, 2022: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • March 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • March 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 11, 2022: [Mail Returned]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • February 08, 2022: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • February 08, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.