U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:22-po-90014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rivera
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 28, 2022: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
  • June 13, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • June 10, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 10, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 02, 2022: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 11, 2022: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • April 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • April 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 08, 2022: [Arraignment - Petty Offense]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • February 10, 2022: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • February 10, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.