U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-po-70003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 18, 2022: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
  • October 18, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge-Misdemeanor Case]
  • October 18, 2022: [Docket Call]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 02, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 16, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 16, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • August 16, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • July 13, 2022: [Docket Call]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • May 11, 2022: [Docket Call]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • April 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • April 13, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • April 05, 2022: [Mail Returned]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • March 24, 2022: [Docket Call]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • February 17, 2022: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • February 17, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.