U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cm-50045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Response to Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • May 10, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 04, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Prob 12B Request/Order Modifying Conditions/Term of Supervision]
  • April 22, 2022: [Disclosure]
  • April 14, 2022: [Violation Report]
  • April 11, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2022: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • April 11, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 30, 2022: [Prob 12C PUBLIC Petition/Order for Warrant or Summons for Offender Under Supervision]
  • March 25, 2022: [Prob 12A Report on Offender Under Supervision]
  • March 24, 2022: [Supplement]
  • March 04, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order]
  • February 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 24, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • February 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.