U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:22-mj-90020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blounner
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint/Case]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Dismiss Complaint/Case]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • April 08, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • April 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • March 04, 2022: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • March 04, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.