U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-mc-00105
  • Case Name: VeroBlue Farms USA, Inc. v. Wulf et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Discovery]
  • August 02, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 02, 2022: [Objection to Order of Magistrate Judge]
  • August 02, 2022: [Stay Discovery]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 02, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 27, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings - Public]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 24, 2022: [Compel]
  • May 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 16, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 06, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • May 06, 2022: [Quash]
  • May 06, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Case Initiating Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.