U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:22-po-90030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 28, 2022: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
  • June 13, 2022: [Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • June 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • June 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 10, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 10, 2022: [Sentencing]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • May 16, 2022: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • May 16, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.