U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01126
  • Case Name: Sterneker v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 29, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Certificate of Compliance]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Service]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • September 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 20, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 08, 2022: [Certificate of Compliance]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Service]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • July 13, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 13, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • July 13, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • June 13, 2022: [Return of Service]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • May 31, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • May 31, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.