U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02202
  • Case Name: Eggerman v. HCA PHYSICIAN SERVICES, INC. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • October 10, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [ADR Report]
  • August 05, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • August 05, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 27, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 15, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • July 15, 2022: [Protective Order]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • June 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • May 31, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • May 31, 2022: [State Court Records]
  • May 31, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.