U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02200
  • Case Name: Hamp v. Giles
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 06, 2023: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Expert Witness Designation]
  • November 08, 2022: [Joint Mediation Notice]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Joint Mediation Notice]
  • September 22, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 12, 2022: [Comparative Fault Designation]
  • September 12, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 01, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 25, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 13, 2022: [Status Report]
  • July 13, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • June 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • May 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 31, 2022: [Certificate of Compliance]
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.