U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02199
  • Case Name: Georgeson v. Prairie Land Electric Cooperative et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 17, 2023: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [ADR Report]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Joint Mediation Notice]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 20, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 15, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 10, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • August 08, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 01, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • June 07, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • May 31, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.