U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01127
  • Case Name: Bank of Hays v. Perez
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • November 15, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • November 14, 2022: [Default Judgment]
  • November 10, 2022: [Show Cause]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • September 13, 2022: [Application for Clerks Entry of Default]
  • September 01, 2022: [Application for Clerks Entry of Default]
  • September 01, 2022: [Show Cause]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • June 15, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 07, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • June 03, 2022: [Alias Summons Issued]
  • June 01, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • May 31, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.