U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02203
  • Case Name: Digital Ally, Inc. v. Culp McAuley, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Mail Returned]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • January 10, 2023: [Vacate]
  • January 09, 2023: [Mail Returned]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • December 27, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 20, 2022: [Leave to Amend Complaint]
  • December 06, 2022: [Show Cause]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines]
  • November 29, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint]
  • November 10, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 09, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 09, 2022: [Leave to Amend Complaint]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order]
  • November 04, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 04, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 04, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 02, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 02, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery Hearing]
  • October 20, 2022: [Discovery Hearing]
  • October 03, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 26, 2022: [ESI Protocol]
  • September 23, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 06, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 05, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 24, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 08, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Transcript]
  • July 29, 2022: [SEALED Transcript]
  • July 26, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • July 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 18, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • June 29, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 24, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 23, 2022: [Exhibits in Support of Motion]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal]
  • June 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • June 21, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • June 13, 2022: [Alias Summons Issued]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order]
  • June 09, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 08, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 03, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 01, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 01, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 01, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 31, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • May 31, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 31, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 31, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • May 31, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.