U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01129
  • Case Name: Sheridan v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • October 27, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Service]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice of Service]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • July 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • July 20, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 19, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 15, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 01, 2022: [Certificate of Compliance]
  • June 01, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 01, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • June 01, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • June 01, 2022: [State Court Records]
  • June 01, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.