U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01128
  • Case Name: Yeshiambel v. Garland et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Service]
  • January 23, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 14, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 09, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Service]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Discovery]
  • October 05, 2022: [Stay Discovery]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 20, 2022: [Status Report Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [Response to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 29, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • August 25, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal]
  • August 22, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 22, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • June 01, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 01, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.